IL HR1138 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to declare the City of Chicago the 51st state of the United States of America and separate it from the rest of Illinois.
Title
CHICAGO-51ST STATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-05-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1138&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1138.htm |