IL HR1119 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the Illinois State Board of Education and each school district in this State to consider the potential benefits of inclusive education for students with and without disabilities in Illinois.
Title
INCLUSIVE EDUCATION INITIATIVE
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. John Anthony [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-05-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-05-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 113-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-27 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jil Tracy |