IL HR1078 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Acknowledges May of 2018 as Asian American and Pacific Islander Heritage Month.
Title
ASIAN AMERICAN HERITAGE MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-05-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-05-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1078&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1078.htm |