IL HR1076 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress and the President of the United States to reauthorize the Terrorism Risk Insurance Program.
Title
URGE FEDS-REAUTHORIZE TRIA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-05-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2014-05-19 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1076&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR1076.htm |