IL HR1071 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes Megan Bugg for her efforts to raise awareness of childhood cancer and fight for increased funding for research.
Title
RECOGNIZE-MEGAN BUGG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2018-05-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1071&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1071.htm |