IL HR1044 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the week of May 13 - May 19, 2018 as "Food Allergy Awareness Week".
Title
FOOD ALLERGY AWARENESS WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1044&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1044.htm |