IL HR1041 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October 31, 2014 as Svengoolie/Rich Koz Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
SVENGOOLIE/RICH KOZ DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-05-14 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 |
2014-05-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kay Hatcher |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1041&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR1041.htm |