IL HR1021 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges state agencies to expand comprehensive cardiovascular screening programs to allow for earlier identification of patients at risk of cardiovascular events. Urges state agencies to explore ways to collaborate with federal and national agencies and organizations to establish or expand comprehensive cardiovascular screening programs. Urges an update of the State's cardiovascular plan to accelerate quality improvements in the care rendered to these patients such that screening, treatment, monitoring, and improved health outcomes are achieved. States support for the creation of policies to decrease the rising number of deaths of Americans as a result of ASCVD.
Title
URGES-CARDIOVASCULAR SCREENING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | House | Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Huffman |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2023-01-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-01-10 | House | Motion Prevailed to Suspend Rule by Voice Vote |
2023-01-10 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-01-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-01-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-01-06 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2023-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2023-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2023-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2023-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-01-06 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Robert Rita |
2023-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-01-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-01-06 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-01-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-11-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1021&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR1021.htm |