IL HR0986 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Department of Child and Family Services to immediately resume its 35-year precedent of issuing monthly child abuse reports and executive statistical summary reports.
Title
DCFS-CHILD ABUSE REPORTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-17 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=986&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0986.htm |