IL HR0972 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes May of 2018 as "Foster Care Month" in Illinois.
Title
FOSTER CARE MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] |
Rep. David Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-18 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=972&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0972.htm |