IL HR0944 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to undertake a study to determine the appropriateness of mandating a mechanism for electronically-prescribed prescription orders to electronically transmit "discontinuation", "cancel", or "stop" orders from health care providers to pharmacies and to examine the effects of auto-refill programs on the unnecessary filling of discontinued medications no longer endorsed by the prescriber.
Title
PRESCRIPTION DISCONTINUATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=944&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0944.htm |