IL HR0926 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May 9, 2012, as "Moms on a Mission Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
MOMS ON A MISSION DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2012-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-05-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 |
2012-05-01 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-05-01 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-04-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=926&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0926.htm |