IL HR0922 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the members of the General Assembly to work together to modernize and reform the tax code and to immediately pass a Fiscal Year 2016 budget that will stabilize the lives of Illinois' children, families, communities, and businesses.
Title
RESPONSIBLE BUDGET RESOLUTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-07-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-03-29 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2016-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=922&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0922.htm |