IL HR0917 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois State Board of Education to officially recognize the importance and benefits of school diversity and to set it as a priority when making decisions regarding admissions policies and practices, creation of new schools, school rezoning, and other pertinent decisions and to commit to having a strategy in each district for overcoming impediments to school diversity.
Title
SCHOOL DIVERSITY - ISBE
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-11-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-11-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2016-11-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=917&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0917.htm |