IL HR0914 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the fourth week of April 2018 as "Illinois Distracted Driving Awareness Week".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISTRACTED DRIVING WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseResolution Adopted
2018-05-10HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-09HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-23HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback