IL HR0887 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Admonishes the Humane Society of the United States for their misleading practices, including their disrespectful work culture and lack of commitment to supporting animals.
Title
HUMANE SOCIETY WORK CULTURE
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. David Reis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=887&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0887.htm |