IL HR0866 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares that it is in the best interest of the people of Illinois for the Governor of the State of Illinois to immediately act to shape a narrowly tailored approach to drastically improve the housing stock, communities, and conditions of and for people of African descent residing in the State of Illinois. Urges the Governor of the State of Illinois and the Illinois General Assembly to invoke the principles of the Equitable Economic Land Use Plan of 2020 with all deliberate speed. Declares that funding should be directed toward low-income communities in Illinois for infrastructure, housing, and other economic development. Declares that the Illinois Code of Civil Procedure and the Mortgage Act should be reformed and to further fund existing housing programs that will assist people of African descent in the facilitation of the Equitable Economic Land Use Plan of 2020. Declares that the Menard Correctional Center should revert back to its original name, Southern Illinois Penitentiary.
Title
EQUITABLE ECONOMIC LAND USE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-01-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-01-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-001-000 |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-11-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2020-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2020-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2020-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2020-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-06-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=866&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0866.htm |