IL HR0843 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted 109-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Ford Heights Public Library District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FORD HEIGHTS LIBRARY-AUD GEN

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted 109-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-18HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback