IL HR0824 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the President and Congress to begin an expedited withdrawal of military forces from Afghanistan, thus accelerating the current withdrawal plan set in place.
Title
URGE US-AFGHANISTAN WITHDRAWAL
Sponsors
Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Wayne Rosenthal [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
Rep. Joseph Lyons [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2012-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-03-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 016-001-000 |
2012-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons |
2012-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
2012-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-06 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2012-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |