IL HR0821 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates the Republic of China (Taiwan) on its successful presidential and parliamentary elections and on the re-election to a second term of President Ma Ying-jeou and on the 20th anniversary of its participation in the Asia-Pacific Economic Cooperation (APEC) forum to increase Taiwan's international space and contribution to the global community. Affirms support for the meaningful participation of Taiwan in the United Nations Framework Convention on Climate Change (UNFCCC) and the International Civil Aviation Organization (ICAO) with observer status.
Title
CONGRATS - TAIWAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-03-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-03-06 | House | Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee |
2012-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=821&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0821.htm |