IL HR0808 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct an audit of Lincoln-Way Community High School District 210 covering Fiscal Years 2005 through 2015.
Title
AUDIT LINCOLN-WAY HS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-10-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-10-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=808&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0808.htm |