IL HR0796 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the General Assembly to pass legislation that requires Chicago Public Schools board members, who are currently appointed by the Mayor of Chicago, to be elected by the people.
Title
CPS BOARD-ELECTED
Sponsors
Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Juliana Stratton [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-07 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2018-02-13 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=796&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0796.htm |