IL HR0796 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the General Assembly to work towards a biennial budget.
Title
BIENNIAL BUDGET - URGES
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] | Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] |
Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Sara Jimenez [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-12-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-12-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-10-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-09-25 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-09-25 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2015-09-25 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-09-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=796&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0796.htm |