IL HR0795 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Pledges support for Distracted Driving Awareness Month in April 2022 and strongly urges the citizens and businesses of Illinois to observe Distracted Driving Awareness Month by practicing safe driving behaviors and pledging to drive distraction-free.
Title
DISTRACTED DRIVING MONTH
Sponsors
Sen. Seth Lewis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-04-06 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-04-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2022-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Seth Lewis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=795&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0795.htm |