IL HR0727 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes that pornography harms the State and its citizens and further recognizes the need for education, prevention, research, and policy change at the community and societal level in order to address the epidemic of pornography that is harming the citizens of Illinois and the country as a whole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PORNOGRAPHY-EPIDEMIC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-25HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-12-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback