IL HR0662 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares November of 2017 as "Diabetes and Heart Disease Awareness Month" in the State of Illinois.
Title
DIABETES/HEART DISEASE MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-11-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-11-07 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-11-07 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-11-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=662&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0662.htm |