IL HR0592 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes and appreciate the ideals, goals, and activities of the National Bone Health and Osteoporosis Month in May and encourages the observation of appropriate good health programs and activities concerning the promotion of good bone health throughout the lifetime and the prevention of osteoporosis.
Title
RECOGNIZE-BONE HEALTH MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-04-07 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-04-06 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-31 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-12-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=592&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0592.htm |