IL HR0588 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 5-11, 2024 as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week. Encourages anyone experiencing uncontrollable, abnormal, and repetitive movements to consult their healthcare provider regarding their symptoms.
Title
TARDIVE DYSKINESIA WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2024-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-05-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 006-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=588&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0588.htm |