IL HR0572 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reaffirms commitment to the strengthening and deepening of the sister-state ties between the State of Illinois and Taiwan, R.O.C. Reaffirms support for the Taiwan Relations Act (TRA) and supports Illinois businesses to refer to Taiwan, R.O.C. as Taiwan. Endorses Taiwan's efforts to secure the signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement (BTA), the Avoidance of Double Taxation Agreement (ADTA), and the Indo-Pacific Economic Framework for Prosperity (IPEF) with the United States and reiterates support for a closer economic and trade partnership between the State of Illinois and Taiwan. Expresses continued support for Taiwan's meaningful participation in international organizations that impact the health, safety, and well-being of the people of Taiwan and supports Taiwan's aspiration to make more contributions in international societies.
Title
REAFFIRMS-COMMITMENT TO TAIWAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=572&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0572.htm |