IL HR0547 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares February 2, 2024 as "World Wetlands Day" in the State of Illinois. Urges state agencies, local governments, and other organizations to work together to preserve and protect wetlands.
Title
WORLD WETLANDS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-06-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=547&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0547.htm |