IL HR0538 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the need to reunite communities split by the creation of the interstate highway system. Recognizes the importance of expressway lids as a partial solution to that problem. Urges the State of Illinois to utilize federal resources, in partnership with state agencies and local entities, to begin reconnecting these communities with, among other things, expressway lids.
Title
EXPRESSWAY LIDS-INTERSTATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-10 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 013-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-12-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=538&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0538.htm |