IL HR0471 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor JB Pritzker and the Illinois State Board of Education to support nonpublic school autonomy when it comes to making decisions for their schools, including decisions related to the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
NONPUBLIC SCHOOL AUTONOMY
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Ozinga [R] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-09-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-09-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=471&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0471.htm |