IL HR0397 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates June 11, 2011 as "Willie Nelson Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
WILLIE NELSON DAY
Sponsors
Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Dan Reitz [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Thomas Holbrook [D] |
Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-29 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed |
2011-05-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-29 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=397&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0397.htm |