IL HR0351 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Mayor of the City of Chicago to officially recognize the importance and benefits of school diversity and to set it as a priority when making decisions regarding admissions policies and practices, creation of new schools, school rezoning, and other pertinent decisions and to commit to having a strategy in each district for overcoming impediments to school diversity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL DIVERSITY - CHICAGO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-25HouseResolution Adopted
2017-05-30HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback