IL HR0326 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the date of May 8, 2019 as Alpha Kappa Alpha Day in the State of Illinois in honor of Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated, and its work.
Title
ALPHA KAPPA ALPHA DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=326&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0326.htm |