IL HR0316 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the federal government to recognize Specialist Edward Aldrich and all the members of Company B, 720th Military Police, the Bushwackers, with the Combat Infantry Badge for their service and sacrifice to our country during the Vietnam War.
Title
BUSHWACKERS-INFANTRY BADGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=316&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0316.htm |