IL HR0274 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Strongly opposes any and all efforts by the Trump Administration to cut the Meals on Wheels Program and Congregate Meals Program, eliminate the Community Development Block Grant, eliminate the Community Services Block Grant, and slash funding for the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEALS ON WHEELS - NO CUTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24HouseResolution Adopted
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-04-26HouseRecommends Be Adopted Aging Committee; 010-000-000
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-18HouseAssigned to Aging Committee
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback