IL HR0269 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares April of 2017 and 2018 as Autism Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUTISM AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-05-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-05-11HouseResolution Adopted
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-04-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2017-04-18HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback