IL HR0253 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates the Republic of China (Taiwan) on the centennial of its birth in 1911.
Title
CONGRATS-REPUBLIC OF CHINA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2011-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-04-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-04-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=253&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0253.htm |