IL HR0196 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the week of August 5, 2019 as "Adolescent Immunization Week" in Illinois to increase public awareness of the importance of preteens and adolescents receiving vaccines against meningococcal disease, human papillomavirus, influenza, tetanus, diphtheria, pertussis, measles, mumps, and rubella, and to promote outreach and education efforts concerning vaccination. Urges the Illinois Department of Public Health to promote Adolescent Immunization Week and to disseminate educational resources on infectious diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADOLESCENT IMMUNIZATION WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseResolution Adopted
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-05-01HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2019-03-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback