IL HR0194 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Condemns the acts of harassment and violence that have been committed recently against Jews, Muslims, refugees, LGBTQ, and communities of color.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HATE CRIMES - CONDEMNS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-28HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback