IL HR0184 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the continued use of vaccines for children, adolescents, and adults to ensure the safety and health of the citizens of this State.
Title
ENCOURAGES VACCINATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-04-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=184&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0184.htm |