IL HR0180 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Psychotropic Substances Suicide Risk Task Force within the Department of Public Health.
Title
CREATES-PSYCHOTROPIC TASK FORC
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=180&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0180.htm |