IL HR0178 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges YouTube, Google, and all websites that cater to children to maintain stringent policies regarding the content that is posted by the public. Urges the aforementioned sites to remove media that could be life-threatening to children and to help law enforcement officials locate the creators of the disturbing content. Urges parents to always exercise caution when allowing children to access the Internet, as there is no guarantee that all the material they will be exposed to is safe, regardless of whether they are using a website intended for children. Urges the Illinois General Assembly to increase awareness about Internet safety and to advance policies to keep children safe on the web.
Title
INTERNET SAFETY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |