IL HR0170 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the date of March 26, 2015 as Illinois Epilepsy Advocacy Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
IL EPILEPSY ADVOCACY DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-04-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-04-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=170&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0170.htm |