IL HR0157 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-22)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges lawmakers to slow the process of legalizing recreational marijuana in Illinois, so that lawmakers, stakeholders, and experts alike have the chance to consider the societal impact of legalization and examine all the data from other states that have passed similar legislation.
Title
MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION PROCESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-02-28 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=157&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0157.htm |