IL HR0151 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States opposition to any plan to sell the Illinois Tollway and urges the Illinois Toll Highway Authority be dissolved and operations of the highway be conveyed to the Illinois Department of Transportation to be operated as a freeway.
Title
ILL TOLLWAY SALE-OPPOSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=151&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0151.htm |