IL HR0135 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Opposes a graduated income tax law in Illinois. Oppose the reconsideration by the Illinois General Assembly of any constitutional measure intended to yet again reopen the flat-rate income tax language of subsection (a) of Section 3 of Article IX of the Constitution of Illinois.
Title
GRADUATED INCOME TAX-OPPOSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=135&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0135.htm |