IL HR0107 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a program audit of the Illinois Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to examine the operations and management of the Department as it relates to the administration of the EDGE (Economic Development for a Growing Economy) tax credit program.
Title
EDGE AUDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=107&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0107.htm |