IL HR0103 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Department of Human Services and the Governor's Opioid Overdose Prevention and Recovery Steering Committee to closely consider funding FDA-authorized PDTs to help patients who are struggling with substance use and opioid use disorders.
Title
PDTS-OPIOID ABUSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-03-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 007-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=103&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0103.htm |